IN SB0117 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that it is an unfair practice for a vehicle manufacturer or distributor to enter into an agreement in which a vehicle dealer is required to waive certain provisions dealing with unfair practices in the vehicle sales profession or franchise practices. Establishes an exception for voluntary agreements in which separate consideration is offered and accepted. Exempts certain persons that buy or sell motor vehicles from the requirement of maintaining a bond satisfactory to the secretary of state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle sales and purchases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Public Law 17
2010-03-12 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-11 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-03-08 Signed by the Speaker
2010-03-04 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-03-02 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 252: Yeas 42, Nays 0
2010-03-02 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2010-02-25 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2010-02-25 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 238: Yeas 93, Nays 0
2010-02-22 Amendment 1 (M. Smith), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-22 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-02-18 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-02-08 First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2010-02-02 Cosponsor: Rep. Saunders
2010-02-02 House sponsor: Rep. Austin
2010-02-02 Referred to the House
2010-02-02 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 98: Yeas 50 and Nays 0
2010-02-01 Amendment 1 (Head), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-01 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-01-28 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-11 Senator Deig added as coauthor
2010-01-11 Senator Alting added as second author
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Public Policy & Interstate Cooperation
2010-01-05 Authored by Senator Head

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback