IN SB0116 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-09 - Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Out of school time pilot program and fund. Requires the department of education (department) to establish a pilot program to provide grants for out of school time programs that serve students in grades 5 through 8. Establishes eligibility requirements. Establishes the out of school time program fund. Requires, before November 1 of each year, the department to submit a report regarding the pilot program to the governor, budget committee, state board of education, and legislative council.
Title
Out of school time pilot program and fund. Requires the department of education (department) to establish a pilot program to provide grants for out of school time programs that serve students in grades 5 through 8. Establishes eligibility requirements. Establishes the out of school time program fund. Requires, before November 1 of each year, the department to submit a report regarding the pilot program to the governor, budget committee, state board of education, and legislative council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as third author |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senator Melton added as second author |
2017-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kruse |