IN SB0114 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 49
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 49
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professional licensing. Eliminates the jobs creation committee (committee). Transfers duties of the committee to the Indiana professional licensing agency. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Professional licensing. Eliminates the jobs creation committee (committee). Transfers duties of the committee to the Indiana professional licensing agency. Makes conforming changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Law 49 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 349: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-03-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 262: yeas 82, nays 13 |
2017-03-16 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-14 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Select Committee on Government Reduction |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as coauthor |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as coauthor |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as second author |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Morris, Miller and VanNatter |
2017-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative DeVon |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 63: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kruse |