IN SB0114 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the governing body of a school corporation or the chief administrative officer of a nonpublic school system shall authorize, for not more than five instructional days in a school year, the absence and excuse of each school student if the student or a member of the student's household participates or exhibits in the state fair.
Title
Excused absences from school for state fair activities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] | Sen. Michael Delph [R] |
Sen. James Tomes [R] | Rep. Gerald Torr [R] | Rep. Kathy Richardson [R] | Rep. Kreg Battles [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 011402 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 011401 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House Floor - (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 011402 (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 011401 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | Public Law 32 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Motion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 351: yeas 35 and nays 14 |
2014-02-17 | House | Representative Battles added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-17 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 222: yeas 95 and nays 0 |
2014-02-13 | House | SB 114 Amendment #1 (Battles), prevailed. |
2014-02-13 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed. |
2014-02-11 | House | Representative Richardson added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-11 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-02-04 | House | First Reading: Referred to Education |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Representative Torr added as cosponsor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Representative Cherry added as sponsor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 58: yeas 28 and nays 21 |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as coauthor. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senator Delph added as coauthor. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as third author. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass amend, adopted. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Education and Career Development |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |