IN SB0114 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Makes a technical correction concerning calculating the ten year recidivism period under the driving while suspended statute.
Title
Driving while suspended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-02-29 | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the House | |
2012-02-27 | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate | |
2012-02-14 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | |
2012-02-14 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 191: yeas 94, nays 0 | |
2012-02-13 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-09 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code | |
2012-01-24 | House sponsor: Rep. Steuerwald | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-24 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 61: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-23 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-19 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | |
2012-01-19 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Bray |