IN SB0113 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Senator Stoops added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Guardian reimbursement and Medicaid eligibility. Specifies that an amount not to exceed $175 a month in court ordered guardianship fees for an individual who is: (1) in an institution; or (2) applying for or participating in the Medicaid aged and disabled waiver; is exempt from Medicaid income eligibility consideration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Guardian reimbursement and Medicaid eligibility. Specifies that an amount not to exceed $175 a month in court ordered guardianship fees for an individual who is: (1) in an institution; or (2) applying for or participating in the Medicaid aged and disabled waiver; is exempt from Medicaid income eligibility consideration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2019-01-29SenateSenators Breaux and Melton added as coauthors
2019-01-29SenateSenator Ford Jon added as third author
2019-01-24SenateSenator Grooms added as second author
2019-01-14SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-14SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Koch

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback