IN SB0112 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Public Law 2
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Anatomical gifts and individuals with disabilities. Prohibits certain health care entities from discriminating against potential transplant recipients solely on the basis of disability, and authorizes an individual to seek injunctive relief against an entity believed to be in violation of the law. Defines "covered entity". Defines "qualified recipient". Prohibits a state employee health plan, insurer, or health maintenance program from denying coverage for anatomical gifts, transplantation, or related treatment and services solely on the basis of disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anatomical gifts and individuals with disabilities. Prohibits certain health care entities from discriminating against potential transplant recipients solely on the basis of disability, and authorizes an individual to seek injunctive relief against an entity believed to be in violation of the law. Defines "covered entity". Defines "qualified recipient". Prohibits a state employee health plan, insurer, or health maintenance program from denying coverage for anatomical gifts, transplantation, or related treatment and services solely on the basis of disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenatePublic Law 2
2019-04-03SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-01SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-03-19HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-03-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-03-13HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2019-03-12HouseRepresentative Barrett added as cosponsor
2019-03-12HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 306: yeas 91, nays 0
2019-03-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-07HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-03-05HouseRepresentative Hatfield added as cosponsor
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-01-25SenateReferred to the House
2019-01-24SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Breaux added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Bassler added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Bacon
2019-01-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 22: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-01-22SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second author
2019-01-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-17SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Koch

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/112/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/1/b/771b333f/SB0112.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/0/9/e009a342/SB0112.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/d/e/cddea3a5/SB0112.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/5/5/af55f3b8/SB0112.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/e/4/99e4b86f/SB0112.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/b/4/fab44aa7/SB0112.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/6/a/a56a4df6/SB0112.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/0/5/a/e05a921a/SB0112.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/d/6/15d68291/SB0112.22.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/4/3/214315e8/SB0112.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/d/8/a6d80a87/SB0112.306.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback