IN SB0110 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Section 5 effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that if there is only one nominee for election to a conservancy district (district) board of directors (board) to represent an area of the district, the nominee is considered elected. Provides that if there is only one nominee for election to the board for each area for which a director is to be elected, the election is not required to be held and each of the board members is considered to have been elected as if the election had been held. Authorizes the board to enter into leases of land to providers of commercial mobile services that allow for the construction, use, and maintenance of a tower that is used for telecommunications purposes. For districts located in certain counties, if in the opinion of the secretary of the district a freehold has been divided into multiple freeholds to increase the number of voters, allows the secretary to exclude the freeholders of the multiple freeholds from the list of freeholders eligible to vote. Provides that the determination of the secretary may be challenged by petitioning the circuit court that created the district. For other districts, provides that only one vote may be cast per freehold in an election for members of the board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conservancy district elections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Section 5 effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Section 4 effective 03/12/2010
2010-03-25 Sections 2 through 3 effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Section 1 effective 03/12/2010
2010-03-25 Public Law 16
2010-03-12 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-11 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-03-08 Signed by the Speaker
2010-03-04 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-03-01 Senator Simpson added as coauthor
2010-03-01 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 246: Yeas 45, Nays 0
2010-03-01 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2010-02-16 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2010-02-16 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 173: Yeas 91, Nays 2
2010-02-15 Amendment 1 (Koch), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-15 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-02-11 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-02-02 First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2010-01-19 Cosponsors: Reps. Pearson, Koch and Steuerwald
2010-01-19 House sponsor: Rep. Bischoff
2010-01-19 Referred to the House
2010-01-19 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 18: Yeas 50 and Nays 0
2010-01-14 Amendment 1 (Simpson), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-01-14 Amendment 2 (Lawson), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-01-14 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-01-11 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-05 Senator Gard added as second author
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Energy and Environmental Affairs
2010-01-05 Authored by Senator Lawson

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback