IN SB0109 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Senator Houchin added as second author
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Support for educational needs. Urges the legislative council to study the topic of educational support orders during the 2015 interim.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Support for educational needs. Urges the legislative council to study the topic of educational support orders during the 2015 interim.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Civil Law - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-23SenateSenator Houchin added as second author
2015-02-23SenateThird reading: defeated; Roll Call 206: yeas 17, nays 31
2015-02-19SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-17SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-01-06SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law
2015-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Miller Pete

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback