IN SB0108 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacist care study. Urges the legislative council to assign the topic of coverage for pharmacist care to an interim study committee during the 2019 interim of the general assembly.
Title
Pharmacist care study. Urges the legislative council to assign the topic of coverage for pharmacist care to an interim study committee during the 2019 interim of the general assembly.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Chris Garten [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Steven Davisson [R] |
Rep. Karen Engleman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Engleman |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Davisson |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 212: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senator Garten added as second author |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Grooms |