IN SB0105 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
Pending: House Elections and Apportionment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Redistricting standards. Establishes redistricting standards for congressional and state legislative districts. Provides that the initial proposed plans for congressional and state legislative districts must comply with the redistricting standards. Allows the general assembly, during the process by which the initial proposed plans become effective by being enacted as a law, to consider and adopt modifications to the initial proposed plans that deviate from the redistricting standards as long as the reason or reasons for each deviation are publicly explained and documented.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Redistricting standards. Establishes redistricting standards for congressional and state legislative districts. Provides that the initial proposed plans for congressional and state legislative districts must comply with the redistricting standards. Allows the general assembly, during the process by which the initial proposed plans become effective by being enacted as a law, to consider and adopt modifications to the initial proposed plans that deviate from the redistricting standards as long as the reason or reasons for each deviation are publicly explained and documented.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 26 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Amendment #3 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 13 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Amendment #1 (Lanane) failed (Y: 11 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2019-02-22SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-21SenateSenator Glick added as coauthor
2019-02-21SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Wesco
2019-02-21SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 172: yeas 26, nays 23
2019-02-18SenateAmendment #3 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 135: yeas 13, nays 36
2019-02-18SenateAmendment #1 (Lanane) failed; Roll Call 134: yeas 11, nays 37
2019-02-18SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-07SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-05SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-31SenateSenator Ruckelshaus added as coauthor
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senators Walker, Head and Bohacek

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback