IN SB0104 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - First Reading: Referred to Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-11 - First Reading: Referred to Government and Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Government and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that a county, city, town, or township does not have the power to dissolve another political subdivision, except as expressly granted by statute. Specifies a procedure through which a political subdivision that was established by another political subdivision may be dissolved.
Title
Dissolution of political subdivision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 010401 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Local Government - Roll Call 010401 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | First Reading: Referred to Government and Regulatory Reform |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Saunders added as cosponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Representative Neese added as sponsor. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: Passed: Roll Call 144: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: engrossed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Senator Head added as coauthor. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to Local Government |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Authored by Senator Tallian. |