IN SB0102 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Senator Spartz added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Senator Spartz added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study committee on utility taxes and fees. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee (committee) the topic of fees and taxes authorized by Indiana that are collected through utility bills, telecommunication bills, and video service bills. Specifies that the committee will consider: (1) how the fees and taxes are used; (2) the factors driving increased fees and taxes; (3) the best practices of other states; and (4) the potential for reform or reduction of fees and taxes.
Title
Interim study committee on utility taxes and fees.
Sponsors
Sen. John Ruckelshaus [R] | Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Victoria Spartz [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Spartz added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as second author |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 43: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ruckelshaus |