IN SB0101 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Public Law 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education and higher education matters. Amends requirements regarding the development of a student's graduation plan. Provides that a student who is at least 17 years of age has full legal capacity to enter into a contract for a next generation Hoosier educators scholarship. Provides that the requirement that a postsecondary credit bearing proprietary educational institution that ceases operation submit student records to the Indiana archives and records administration applies regardless of any outstanding debts owed to the institution. Repeals a provision that requires a student to develop an initial graduation plan in grade 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education and higher education matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenatePublic Law 9
2021-04-01SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-03-31SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-03-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-03-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-03-17HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2021-03-16HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 266: yeas 98, nays 0
2021-03-15HouseRepresentative Klinker added as cosponsor
2021-03-15HouseRepresentative Smith, V. added as cosponsor
2021-03-15HouseRepresentative Goodrich added as cosponsor
2021-03-15HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-11HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-02HouseRepresentative Behning added as sponsor
2021-03-02HouseRepresentative Jordan removed as sponsor
2021-03-01HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2021-02-17SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-16SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Jordan
2021-02-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 120: yeas 45, nays 0
2021-02-15SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-11SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-11SenateSenator Kruse added as second author
2021-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2021-01-05SenateAuthored by Senator Raatz

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/101/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/f/f/91ff0212/SB0101.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/3/0/f830d63b/SB0101.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/4/2/eb42f6f5/SB0101.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/3/3/c6336c9b/SB0101.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/0/6/6106d460/SB0101.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/b/4/89b4d825/SB0101.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/0/3/5a0329cb/SB0101.04.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/a/e/b5ae2baf/SB0101.03.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/a/0/eea0c352/SB0101.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/9/4/bd94a228/SB0101.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/4/1/3a419aed/SB0101.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/d/4/55d4688f/SB0101.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/c/e/8fcefc6e/SB0101.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/8/4/e/484ed118/SB0101.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/1/6/1/21613627/SB0101.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/e/3/83e3435d/SB0101.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/8/e/e88ea285/SB0101.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/2/0/2620ddab/SB0101.04.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/a/e/79aec76f/SB0101.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/0/8/4108c679/SB0101.120_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/6/1/236132a8/SB0101.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/c/d/15cd0854/SB0101.266_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback