IN SB0101 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Public Law 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Public Law 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Religious freedom restoration. Prohibits a governmental entity from substantially burdening a person's exercise of religion, even if the burden results from a rule of general applicability, unless the governmental entity can demonstrate that the burden: (1) is in furtherance of a compelling governmental interest; and (2) is the least restrictive means of furthering the compelling governmental interest. Provides a procedure for remedying a violation. Specifies that the religious freedom law applies to the implementation or application of a law regardless of whether the state or any other governmental entity or official is a party to a proceeding implementing or applying
Title
Religious freedom restoration. Prohibits a governmental entity from substantially burdening a person's exercise of religion, even if the burden results from a rule of general applicability, unless the governmental entity can demonstrate that the burden: (1) is in furtherance of a compelling governmental interest; and (2) is the least restrictive means of furthering the compelling governmental interest. Provides a procedure for remedying a violation. Specifies that the religious freedom law applies to the implementation or application of a law regardless of whether the state or any other governmental entity or official is a party to a proceeding implementing or applying
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House - Amendment #6 (Bartlett) failed (Y: 30 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-03-19 - House - House - Amendment #2 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 31 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-03-19 - House - House - Amendment #5 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 31 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-03-19 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Riecken) failed (Y: 30 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-03-16 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Lanane) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Tallian) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Tallian) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House - Amendment #6 (Bartlett) failed (Y: 30 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-03-19 - House - House - Amendment #2 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 31 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-03-19 - House - House - Amendment #5 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 31 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-03-19 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Riecken) failed (Y: 30 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-03-16 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #4 (Lanane) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Tallian) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #3 (Tallian) failed (Y: 10 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Public Law 3 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-03-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 322: yeas 40, nays 10 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2015-03-23 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | Representatives Lucas and Rhoads added as cosponsors |
2015-03-23 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-03-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 305: yeas 63, nays 31 |
2015-03-19 | House | Representative Miller added as cosponsor |
2015-03-19 | House | Representative Cook added as cosponsor |
2015-03-19 | House | Representative Burton added as cosponsor |
2015-03-19 | House | Representatives Frizzell, Frye, Hamm, Nisly added as cosponsors |
2015-03-19 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-03-19 | House | Amendment #6 (Bartlett) failed; Roll Call 301: yeas 30, nays 61 |
2015-03-19 | House | Amendment #2 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 300: yeas 31, nays 60 |
2015-03-19 | House | Amendment #5 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 299: yeas 31, nays 60 |
2015-03-19 | House | Amendment #1 (Riecken) failed; Roll Call 298: yeas 30, nays 61 |
2015-03-19 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-03-17 | House | Representative Lehman added as cosponsor |
2015-03-17 | House | Representatives Borders, DeVon, Harman, Heaton, Judy, Koch, Morris, Morrison, Speedy, Thompson, Washburne added as cosponsors |
2015-03-17 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-03-16 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representatives McMillin, Lehe, Smith, M. added as cosponsors |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative Wesco added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 225: yeas 40, nays 10 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senator Leising added as coauthor |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Broden) failed; voice vote |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Lanane) failed; Roll Call 195: yeas 10, nays 40 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 194: yeas 10, nays 40 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 193: yeas 10, nays 40 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senators Yoder, Buck, Banks A, Brown L, Smith, Tomes, Walker, Waltz, Messmer added as coauthors |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senator Steele added as third author |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senator Schneider added as second author |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as first author |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Long removed as first author |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules & Legislative Procedure |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Long |