IN SB0100 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Public Law 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Public Law 8
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Carbon monoxide emissions testing. Provides that a fire department established by a: (1) county; (2) city; (3) town; or (4) township; or a volunteer fire department may provide vehicular carbon monoxide testing (testing) to the owner of a motor vehicle. Requires testing to be offered to the owner of a motor vehicle without charge. Specifies the manner in which testing is to be conducted. Specifies certain paperwork and record keeping requirements. Provides that a test administrator's good faith effort to properly conduct a vehicular carbon monoxide test immunizes the test administrator from civil liability and all associated damages, including punitive
Title
Carbon monoxide emissions testing. Provides that a fire department established by a: (1) county; (2) city; (3) town; or (4) township; or a volunteer fire department may provide vehicular carbon monoxide testing (testing) to the owner of a motor vehicle. Requires testing to be offered to the owner of a motor vehicle without charge. Specifies the manner in which testing is to be conducted. Specifies certain paperwork and record keeping requirements. Provides that a test administrator's good faith effort to properly conduct a vehicular carbon monoxide test immunizes the test administrator from civil liability and all associated damages, including punitive
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | Public Law 8 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-02-21 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 192: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2018-02-19 | House | Representatives Frye and Taylor J added as cosponsors |
2018-02-19 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Macer |
2018-01-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Burton |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 48: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senators Doriot, Ford, Sandlin added as coauthors |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as third author |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second author |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Delph) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Delph |