IN SB0100 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 48
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Public Law 48
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Patronizing a prostitute. Renames the crime of patronizing a prostitute as making an unlawful proposition.
Title
Patronizing a prostitute. Renames the crime of patronizing a prostitute as making an unlawful proposition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Law 48 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-03-22 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2017-03-21 | House | Representative Porter added as cosponsor |
2017-03-21 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 283: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-01-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Mayfield |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 18: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as second author |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bray |