IN SB0099 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-05 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Jury service review. Permits a nursing mother who is denied permission to defer jury service to request the trial judge to reconsider her request for deferral.
Title
Jury service review. Permits a nursing mother who is denied permission to defer jury service to request the trial judge to reconsider her request for deferral.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senators Banks A, Messmer, Tomes added as coauthors |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Representative Steuerwald added as sponsor |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 224: yeas 45, nays 5 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as coauthor |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Zakas) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senators Becker and Delph added as coauthor |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senator Steele added as coauthor |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Senator Leising added as second author |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as first author |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senator Long removed as first author |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted, reassigned to committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules & Legislative Procedure |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Long |