IN SB0098 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 209
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 209
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a study committee made up of representatives of the commission for higher education, representatives of Indiana University, Purdue University, and regional campuses, and eight legislators shall perform: (1) a study of regional campus governance and operations; and (2) an analysis of the Indiana University - Purdue University Fort Wayne campus; and report the results to the legislative council not later than November 30, 2013.
Title
Regional campus governance.
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. James Banks [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] |
Sen. John Broden [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-24 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 209 |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 590: yeas 91, nays 5 |
2013-04-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 514: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2013-04-11 | House | House advisors appointed: Behning, DeVon, Klinker, Macer and Hale |
2013-04-11 | House | House conferees appointed: Heuer and GiaQuinta |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Kruse, Mrvan and Wyss |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Banks and Broden |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2013-04-08 | House | Representative Carbaugh added as cosponsor |
2013-04-08 | House | House Rule 105.1 suspended |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-04-08 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 432: yeas 93, nays 1 |
2013-04-04 | House | Amendment 1 (Heuer), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-04 | House | Amendment 2 (Behning), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-04 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-04-01 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Cosponsors: Reps. GiaQuinta, Morris and Leonard |
2013-02-19 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Heuer |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 147: yeas 49 and nays 0 |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senator Broden added as coauthor |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as coauthor |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Senator Walker added as coauthor |
2013-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senators Banks and Kruse |