IN SB0098 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a county may use property taxes and miscellaneous revenue deposited in the county general fund for the maintenance of county highways. (Current law permits property taxes to be used for highway maintenance only in an emergency and by unanimous vote of the county fiscal body, and the county general fund to be used only for county highway department employees' personal services.) Allows a city department, officer, or employee to obligate the city beyond the amount of money appropriated for that department, officer, or employee if: (1) the obligation is made under a multi-year interlocal cooperation agreement entered into by the city and one or more political subdivisions or governmental entities; and (2) the agreement is approved by the city fiscal body.
Title
County highway maintenance funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-09 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-01 | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 299: yeas 46, nays 1 | |
2012-02-29 | Motion to concur in House amendments filed | |
2012-02-28 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2012-02-28 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 257: yeas 93, nays 1 | |
2012-02-27 | Amendment 1 (Espich), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-02-27 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-20 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-01-24 | Senator Hume added as coauthor | |
2012-01-24 | Cosponsor: Rep. Crawford | |
2012-01-24 | House sponsor: Rep. Espich | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to the House | |
2012-01-24 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 58: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-23 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-19 | Senator Charbonneau added as second author | |
2012-01-19 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Kenley |