IN SB0098 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-02 - First reading: referred to Committee on Labor and Employment
Pending: House Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminates references to the treasurer of state's duties concerning the following pension funds administered by the public employees' retirement fund (PERF): (1) legislators' retirement system; (2) judges' retirement system; (3) prosecuting attorneys retirement fund; and (4) 1977 police officers' and firefighters' retirement and disability fund. (In 2009 the treasurer of state's role as treasurer of PERF was eliminated and those duties were assigned to the PERF board and executive director.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pension fund administered by PERF.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-02 First reading: referred to Committee on Labor and Employment
2010-01-19 Senator Kruse added as third author
2010-01-19 Senator Buck added as second author
2010-01-19 House sponsor: Rep. Niezgodski
2010-01-19 Referred to the House
2010-01-19 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 17: Yeas 50, Nays 0
2010-01-14 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-11 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2010-01-05 Authored by Senator Boots

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback