IN SB0096 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 155
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Veterans pilot program. Extends to 2020 the program that provides assistance for certain providers to provide diagnostic testing and hyperbaric oxygen treatment to veterans. (Under current law, the program expires June 30, 2019.) Allows the state department of health to select and approve up to five providers to provide diagnostic testing and hyperbaric oxygen treatment to veterans receiving treatment under the pilot program. (Under current law, only one provider may be selected and approved.) Requires providers to perform services at cost out of the grant amount awarded to the provider. Removes the restriction on when a veteran's injury occurred in

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans pilot program. Extends to 2020 the program that provides assistance for certain providers to provide diagnostic testing and hyperbaric oxygen treatment to veterans. (Under current law, the program expires June 30, 2019.) Allows the state department of health to select and approve up to five providers to provide diagnostic testing and hyperbaric oxygen treatment to veterans receiving treatment under the pilot program. (Under current law, only one provider may be selected and approved.) Requires providers to perform services at cost out of the grant amount awarded to the provider. Removes the restriction on when a veteran's injury occurred in

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21SenatePublic Law 155
2018-03-21SenateSigned by the Governor
2018-03-20SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-03-19HouseSigned by the Speaker
2018-03-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2018-03-14SenateConference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 381: yeas 46, nays 0
2018-03-13HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 381: yeas 98, nays 0
2018-03-13SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2018-03-13HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2018-03-05HouseHouse advisors appointed: Davisson, Soliday and Shackleford
2018-03-05HouseHouse conferees appointed: Zent and Brown C
2018-03-01SenateSenate advisors appointed: Sandlin, Ford and Mrvan
2018-03-01SenateSenate conferees appointed: Delph and Niezgodski
2018-03-01SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2018-02-28SenateMotion to dissent filed
2018-02-28HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2018-02-27HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 227: yeas 97, nays 0
2018-02-26HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2018-02-22HouseRepresentative Brown, C. added as cosponsor
2018-02-22HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2018-02-12HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2018-02-07SenateReferred to the House
2018-02-06SenateSenator Walker added as coauthor
2018-02-06SenateCosponsors: Representatives Frye and Burton
2018-02-06SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Zent
2018-02-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 160: yeas 47, nays 1
2018-02-06SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 35 (c); technical correction committee report adopted
2018-02-05SenateSenators Kruse, Zakas, Alting added as coauthors
2018-02-05SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2018-02-05SenateAmendment #6 (Delph) prevailed; voice vote
2018-02-05SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2018-02-01SenateSenator Niezgodski added as coauthor
2018-02-01SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2018-01-25SenateCommittee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
2018-01-10SenateSenator Ford added as coauthor
2018-01-10SenateSenator Charbonneau added as third author
2018-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2018-01-03SenateAuthored by Senators Delph and Sandlin

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2018/bills/senate/96/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/b/a/bcba949f/SB0096.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/7/1/4271b8aa/SB0096.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/5/b/875b061d/SB0096.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/d/c/d6dcb5a8/SB0096.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/f/1/73f12627/SB0096.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/d/5/89d5566b/SB0096.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/6/9/ce699aca/SB0096.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/4/b/4e4b9470/SB0096.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/6/f/096f5a9a/SB0096.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/6/8/b6688497/SB0096.05.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/a/f/34afaf9a/SB0096.06.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/d/6/75d67be3/SB0096.06.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/e/a/c6ea1a30/SB0096.07.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/5/0/4d505c74/SB0096.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/f/b/3bfb7b30/SB0096.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/1/a/f91ae0e6/SB0096.160.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/b/0/80b0a13b/SB0096.05.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/c/1/e/bc1e3187/SB0096.227.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/f/5/5ff5518b/SB0096.381.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/5/2/0c5232fe/SB0096.381_1.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback