IN SB0096 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Curricular materials. Extends from three years to four years the timeline for serial maturation of notes issued by a school corporation to buy curricular materials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Curricular materials. Extends from three years to four years the timeline for serial maturation of notes issued by a school corporation to buy curricular materials.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-23SenatePublic Law 128
2016-03-23SenateSigned by the Governor
2016-03-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2016-02-22HouseSigned by the Speaker
2016-02-22SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2016-02-16HouseReturned to the Senate without amendments
2016-02-16HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 188: yeas 95, nays 0
2016-02-15HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-02-11HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2016-02-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2016-02-03HouseRepresentative Rhoads removed as cosponsor
2016-01-27SenateReferred to the House
2016-01-26SenateCosponsors: Representatives Behning, Rhoads, Klinker
2016-01-26SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Truitt
2016-01-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 54: yeas 49, nays 0
2016-01-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2016-01-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2016-01-14SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2016-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education & Career Development
2016-01-05SenateAuthored by Senators Alting and Kenley

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2016/bills/senate/96/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/9/5/9695e0ac/SB0096.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/5/6/915685f3/SB0096.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/2/a/032ab025/SB0096.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/8/5/f/a85ff9f4/SB0096.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/0/e/7b0e109e/SB0096.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/3/2/8332d6a6/SB0096.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/8/9/5389014b/SB0096.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/c/a/e/ecae1be9/SB0096.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/8/d/638d17c8/SB0096.54.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/0/5/08057a60/SB0096.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/b/3/cbb34fa2/SB0096.188.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback