IN SB0095 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Pending: House Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
Pending: House Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Coverage for living organ donors. Prohibits an insurer that issues a policy of life insurance, disability insurance, or long term care insurance from taking certain actions with respect to the coverage of individuals who are living organ donors. Specifies that certain actions constitute an unfair and deceptive act and practice in the business of insurance when taken against a living organ donor by an insurer.
Title
Coverage for living organ donors.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Ann Vermilion [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senator Alting added as third author |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as second author |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Clere and Shackleford |
2022-01-11 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Vermilion |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 11: yeas 45, nays 1 |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bohacek |