IN SB0094 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 12 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-01-12 - Referred to the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Sentence modification. Establishes a procedure to allow certain inmates in the department of correction (department) an additional opportunity to request sentence modification from the sentencing court if the department has recommended sentence modification. Requires that an inmate who receives sentence modification be placed under supervision of: (1) a community transition program; (2) a court; (3) community corrections program; or (4) a supervised reentry program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentence modification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-12SenateReferred to the House
2022-01-11SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2022-01-11SenateSenator Young M added as second author
2022-01-11SenateCosponsor: Representative Negele
2022-01-11SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Clere
2022-01-11SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 10: yeas 34, nays 12
2022-01-10SenateAmendment #1 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote
2022-01-10SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2022-01-06SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2022-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2022-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bohacek

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2022/bills/senate/94/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/1/e/e71edec5/SB0094.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/1/a/dd1aa204/SB0094.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/6/e/f/d6ef45b9/SB0094.03.ENGS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/5/7/e/157e2cdb/SB0094.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/8/8/7e88445a/SB0094.02.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/f/3/39f33627/SB0094.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/3/d/9c3d2e76/SB0094.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/d/8/4/bd84fb17/SB0094.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/3/b/5b3b194b/SB0094.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/9/c/409c03de/SB0094.03.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/e/a/2/7ea2f513/SB0094.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/4/b/dd4b450b/SB0094.10_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback