IN SB0094 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Public Law 92
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Pension matters. Provides that the Indiana public retirement system (INPRS) shall pay the governors' retirement and surviving spouse pensions from the public employees' retirement fund (PERF). (Current law makes the auditor of state responsible for the payments.) Modifies provisions related to the pension entitlement for the surviving spouse of a governor. Changes the definition of "retired participant" in the retirement medical benefits account statute. Eliminates the requirement that INPRS shall make an actuarial valuation of the assets and liabilities of the retiree health benefit trust fund at least every two years and instead requires INPRS each year to report the assets and liabilities of the retiree health benefit trust fund and make recommendations for employer contribution amounts. Provides that if an individual becomes a participant in the public employees' defined contribution plan with respect to the individual's service as a volunteer firefighter, the individual does not earn creditable service in the fund for service with a volunteer fire department. Provides that interest shall be credited to the account of each participant in the prosecuting attorneys' retirement fund at least annually. Specifies the repayment conditions that apply if a participant of the judges' retirement system or a fund member of the 1977 police officers' and firefighters' pension and disability fund withdraws from the respective fund and again becomes a participant or member of the respective fund at a later date. For purposes of the PERF and state teachers' retirement fund: (1) adds survivors and beneficiaries to provisions related to recouping, stopping, or terminating benefits; (2) provides that if an overpayment occurs, the board may not require a member, survivor, or beneficiary to pay more than 25% of their monthly benefit toward the overpayment; and (3) provides that if an overpayment began before July 1, 2015 and was caused by no fault of the member, survivor, or beneficiary, the board may only require a member, survivor, or beneficiary to pay the amount of the overpayment of benefits received during the six years before the date INPRS discovers the overpayment and attempts to provide notice of the overpayment. Provides that the budget agency may transfer appropriations from federal or dedicated funds to the retiree health benefit trust fund. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the interim study committee on pension management oversight.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pension matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 31 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenatePublic Law 92
2021-04-22SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-08SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 371: yeas 31, nays 16
2021-04-06SenateMotion to concur filed
2021-04-06HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-04-06SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2021-04-05HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 350: yeas 84, nays 11
2021-04-01HouseAmendment #1 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote
2021-04-01HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-03-25HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-01HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
2021-01-29SenateReferred to the House
2021-01-28SenateSenator Kruse added as second author
2021-01-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Thompson
2021-01-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 27: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-01-26SenateAmendment #3 (Boots) prevailed; voice vote
2021-01-26SenateAmendment #2 (Tallian) failed; voice vote
2021-01-26SenateAmendment #1 (Boots) prevailed; voice vote
2021-01-26SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-01-14SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
2021-01-05SenateAuthored by Senator Boots

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/94/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/f/3/47f31015/SB0094.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/1/a/a51a7b7d/SB0094.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/e/d/41edf101/SB0094.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/9/9/9d99a3ee/SB0094.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/2/6/9d2644d8/SB0094.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/d/1/d4d1eb95/SB0094.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/3/2/073221d4/SB0094.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/5/d/c75de85a/SB0094.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/9/3/62932d83/SB0094.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/e/6/cae6ebd1/SB0094.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/a/7/f/1a7f2013/SB0094.06.ENRH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/c/2/9dc2a714/SB0094.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/8/8/63883919/SB0094.02.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/5/8/2/958255d4/SB0094.02.COMS.AMS003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/3/2/73320ca0/SB0094.04.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/f/0/6cf0c973/SB0094.04.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/d/9/26d9a814/SB0094.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/0/4/2e041532/SB0094.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/6/f/566f5dc4/SB0094.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/7/8/1b7834c9/SB0094.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/3/4/2c34b8a1/SB0094.03.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/2/9/5/7295662e/SB0094.04.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/f/f/b/fffb5432/SB0094.03.ENGS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/b/a/9/4ba9b28b/SB0094.05.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/d/e/9/2de9c7ec/SB0094.05.ENGH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/5/a/5/75a526c0/SB0094.05.ENGH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/3/7/44375ac7/SB0094.06.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/b/0/e/5b0e21e3/SB0094.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/2/e/6b2e7e54/SB0094.27_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/d/b/42db154c/SB0094.03.ENGS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/b/9/4/eb941b99/SB0094.350_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/5/b/695bccb0/SB0094.371_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback