IN SB0094 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 212
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Interim study committee. Urges the legislative council to assign the topic of municipal annexation to the appropriate interim study committee during the 2019 interim.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interim study committee. Urges the legislative council to assign the topic of municipal annexation to the appropriate interim study committee during the 2019 interim.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05SenatePublic Law 212
2019-05-05SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-22SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 546: yeas 45, nays 0
2019-04-18SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-04-18SenateDissent withdrawn
2019-04-08HouseHouse advisors appointed: Ellington, Negele and Pierce
2019-04-08HouseHouse conferees appointed: Mahan and Campbell
2019-04-08SenateSenate advisors appointed: Doriot and Taylor G
2019-04-08SenateSenate conferees appointed: Boots and Lanane
2019-04-04SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2019-04-04SenateMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-03HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 384: yeas 92, nays 3
2019-04-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-05HouseRepresentative Negele added as cosponsor
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2019-02-06SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-04SenateCosponsors: Representatives Ellington and Cherry
2019-02-04SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Mahan
2019-02-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 58: yeas 36, nays 13
2019-01-31SenateSenator Doriot added as third author
2019-01-31SenateAmendment #1 (Boots) prevailed; voice vote
2019-01-31SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-01-28SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-24SenateSenator Head added as second author
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Boots

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/94/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/6/e/946edd0e/SB0094.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/0/0/020093d2/SB0094.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/7/0/6/9706e03f/SB0094.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/4/c/0/04c08389/SB0094.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/a/4/0ba496df/SB0094.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/a/a/65aa2c4f/SB0094.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/7/a/c77a4068/SB0094.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/b/3/e2b3780a/SB0094.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/e/9/99e952dc/SB0094.05.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/f/7/a6f7421d/SB0094.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/e/2/44e264da/SB0094.58.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/7/5/dd753b8a/SB0094.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/9/6/6/396616ef/SB0094.384.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/c/b/44cb36ba/SB0094.546.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback