IN SB0094 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Public Law 72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-29 - Public Law 72
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Statute of limitations for rape. Provides that a rape charge otherwise barred by the statute of limitations may be brought within five years of the time that: (1) the state first discovers DNA evidence sufficient to charge the offender; (2) the state first becomes aware of the existence of a recording that provides evidence sufficient to charge the offender; or (3) a person confesses to the offense.
Title
Statute of limitations for rape. Provides that a rape charge otherwise barred by the statute of limitations may be brought within five years of the time that: (1) the state first discovers DNA evidence sufficient to charge the offender; (2) the state first becomes aware of the existence of a recording that provides evidence sufficient to charge the offender; or (3) a person confesses to the offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Hale) prevailed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Hale) prevailed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Committee on Courts and Criminal Code - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | Senate | Public Law 72 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 361: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as coauthor |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as coauthor |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2015-03-25 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2015-03-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 318: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2015-03-23 | House | Amendment #1 (Hale) prevailed; Roll Call 313: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2015-03-23 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | Representative Olthoff added as cosponsor |
2015-03-02 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Senators Bassler, Eckerty, Merritt added as coauthors |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Representatives Smaltz and Hale added as cosponsors |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Representative Cherry added as sponsor |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 40: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senators Miller, Pat and Young, M. added as coauthors |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senator Steele added as third author |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Senator Arnold added as coauthor |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Senator Crider added as first author |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Senator Long removed as first author |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted, reassigned to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2015-01-06 | Senate | First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules & Legislative Procedure |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Long |