IN SB0091 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Public Law 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adds a definition of "college and career readiness". Provides that before July 1, 2014, the state board of education (state board) shall adopt Indiana college and career readiness educational standards. Provides that during the 2015-2016 school year, the state board shall authorize the department to administer either the ISTEP assessment or a comparable assessment program that is aligned with the educational standards. Provides that before the state board may authorize a new assessment program, the state board shall submit the proposed assessment program to the budget committee for review. Makes technical and conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Concur in House Amendments (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - (Y: 67 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 27 N: 63 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-02-26 - House - House Floor - (Y: 28 N: 60 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - House - House Committee on Education - Roll Call 009104 (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education and Career Development - Roll Call 009102 (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-24SenatePublic Law 31
2014-03-24SenateSigned by the Governor
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-14SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-14HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-12SenateMotion to Concur in House Amendments: prevailed; Roll Call 388: yeas 35 and nays 13
2014-03-10SenateSenator Kruse added as first author.
2014-03-10SenateSenator Schneider removed as first author.
2014-03-10SenateSenator Kruse removed as second author.
2014-02-27HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2014-02-27HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 315: yeas 67 and nays 26
2014-02-27HouseRepresentative Morris added as cosponsor.
2014-02-26HouseSB 91 Amendment #3 (Battles), failed.
2014-02-26HouseSB 91 Amendment #2 (Battles), failed.
2014-02-26HouseSecond reading: engrossed.
2014-02-24HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-10HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Education
2014-02-04SenateRepresentative Rhoads added as cosponsor.
2014-02-04SenateRepresentative Thompson added sponsor.
2014-02-04SenateReferred to the House
2014-02-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 143: yeas 36 and nays 12
2014-02-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-02-03SenateSB 91 Amendment #1 (Schneider), prevailed.
2014-01-30SenateSenator Kruse added as second author.
2014-01-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-01-24SenateSenator Schneider added as first author.
2014-01-24SenateSenator Long removed as first author.
2014-01-23SenateCommittee report: amended, reassigned to Education and Career Development
2014-01-07SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Rules and Legislative Procedure
2014-01-07SenateAuthored by Senator Long

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/senate/91/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/3/6/3736c34f/SB0091.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/9/e/329e69d5/SB0091.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/2/3/ac23459e/SB0091.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/6/9/d/069d4bb8/SB0091.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/9/0/3c902271/SB0091.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/d/0/fed0a092/SB0091.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/f/b/1bfbdab9/SB0091.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/c/b/3/7cb37c7f/SB0091.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/1/3/3713eba5/SB0091.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/6/f/196fd19a/SB0091.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/1/1/c3118ffd/SB0091.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/8/8/3388921d/SB0091.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/2/0/b/a20b5395/SB0091.04.ENGS.143.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/6/1/b/461bbedb/SB0091.02.COMS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/b/8/36b8d212/SB0091.04.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/f/4/adf4d2c0/SB0091.05.COMH.297.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/f/5/52f54119/SB0091.05.COMH.298.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/d/3/a1d3737b/SB0091.05.COMH.315.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/c/1/79c136a2/SB0091.05.COMH.388.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback