IN SB0088 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor
Pending: House Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor
Pending: House Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription drug rebates and pricing. Provides that, for individual health insurance coverage, the defined cost sharing for a prescription drug be calculated at the point of sale and based on a price that is reduced by an amount equal to at least 85% of all rebates received by the insurer in connection with the dispensing or administration of the prescription drug. Requires that, for group health insurance coverage, an insurer: (1) pass through to a plan sponsor 100% of all rebates received or estimated to be received by the insurer concerning the dispensing or administration of prescription drugs to the covered individuals of the plan sponsor; (2) provide a plan sponsor, at the time of contracting, the option of calculating defined cost sharing for covered individuals of the plan sponsor at the point of sale based on a price that is reduced by some or all of the rebates received or estimated to be received by the insurer concerning the dispensing or administration of the prescription drug; and (3) disclose specified information to the plan sponsor. Allows the department of insurance to enforce the provisions and impose a civil penalty.
Title
Prescription drug rebates and pricing.
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Charbonneau [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] |
Rep. Bradford Barrett [R] | Rep. Ann Vermilion [R] | Rep. Robin Shackleford [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor |
2022-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Vermilion A |
2022-01-31 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Barrett |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 102: yeas 31, nays 18 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Amendment #6 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Senator Becker added as second author |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |