IN SB0088 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Third reading: failed for lack of constitutional majority; Roll Call 215: yeas 25, nays 25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Third reading: failed for lack of constitutional majority; Roll Call 215: yeas 25, nays 25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
School calendar. Prohibits public schools and accredited nonpublic schools from beginning student instructional days for the school year before the last Monday in August, beginning with the 2018-2019 school year.
Title
School calendar. Prohibits public schools and accredited nonpublic schools from beginning student instructional days for the school year before the last Monday in August, beginning with the 2018-2019 school year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 25 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third reading: failed for lack of constitutional majority; Roll Call 215: yeas 25, nays 25 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as coauthor |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as third author |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as second author |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Senator Tomes removed as second author |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as second author |
2017-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |