IN SB0088 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Solid waste management districts. Authorizes the legislative body of a county to do one, but not both, of the following: (1) Adopt an ordinance specifying that a district may not levy within the county a property tax that is first due and payable in 2017 or in 2018. (2) Adopt an ordinance specifying that a district may not levy within the county a property tax that is first due and payable in 2018. Provides that no solid waste management districts may levy a property tax that is first due and payable after 2018, other than a property tax for pre-existing
Title
Solid waste management districts. Authorizes the legislative body of a county to do one, but not both, of the following: (1) Adopt an ordinance specifying that a district may not levy within the county a property tax that is first due and payable in 2017 or in 2018. (2) Adopt an ordinance specifying that a district may not levy within the county a property tax that is first due and payable in 2018. Provides that no solid waste management districts may levy a property tax that is first due and payable after 2018, other than a property tax for pre-existing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Tax & Fiscal Policy |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kenley |