IN SB0088 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-09 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a county auditor may require an individual to provide evidence proving that the individual's residence is the individual's principal place of residence for purposes of the homestead standard deduction. Provides that the county auditor may limit the evidence that an individual may submit to a state income tax return, a valid driver's license, or a valid voter registration card showing that the residence for which the deduction is claimed is the individual's principal place of residence. Provides that if an individual's property is not eligible for the deduction because the county auditor has determined that the property is not the property owner's principal place of residence, the property owner may appeal the county auditor's determination to the county property tax assessment board of appeals.
Title
Proof of residency for homestead deduction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-02-01 | Cosponsors: Reps. Yarde, Pond and Turner | |
2012-02-01 | House sponsor: Rep. Dodge | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to the House | |
2012-02-01 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 163: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-01-31 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-31 | Senator Glick added as second author | |
2012-01-31 | Senator Glick removed as coauthor | |
2012-01-26 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-24 | Senator Glick added as coauthor | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senator Kruse |