IN SB0087 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a medical director of a police or fire department or a volunteer fire department must provide a written explanation to an individual who is a member of the department, and as a condition of employment or appointment, holds a certification to provide emergency medical services, if the medical director refuses or fails to supervise or attest to the competency of the individual to provide emergency medical services or suspends the individual from performing emergency medical services. Provides that, before a department takes any employment or appointment related action against the individual, the individual is entitled to a hearing and appeal of the medical director's refusal, failure, or suspension. Requires the board or commission hearing the appeal to consult with an independent medical expert who must have certain qualifications in order to determine whether the individual followed the applicable emergency medical services protocol, if the medical director's action that is the subject of the appeal is based on a health care decision made by the individual in performing emergency medical services.
Title
Suspensions or terminations of EMS personnel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 13 | |
2010-03-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-04 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-01 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | |
2010-03-01 | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 244: Yeas 45, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-01 | Motion to concur in House amendments filed | |
2010-02-22 | Returned to the Senate with amendments | |
2010-02-22 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 191: Yeas 78, Nays 18 | |
2010-02-18 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-16 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Labor and Employment | |
2010-02-02 | Senator Boots added as second author | |
2010-02-02 | Cosponsor: Rep. Tyler | |
2010-02-02 | House sponsor: Rep. Moseley | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the House | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 93: Yeas 49 and Nays 1 | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-19 | Senator M. Young added as coauthor | |
2010-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor | |
2010-01-05 | Authored by Senator Tallian |