IN SB0085 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Funding school transportation and public transit. Permits a redevelopment commission outside Marion County to provide revenue on an annual basis to a school corporation or public transportation corporation from property taxes allocated to the redevelopment commission in a tax increment financing allocation area. Specifies the amount of property taxes that may be transferred by the redevelopment commission. Requires a joint public hearing of the legislative body of the unit that established the tax increment financing area, the redevelopment commission, and the governing body of the school corporation or public transportation corporation and the adoption of substantially similar authorizing resolutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funding school transportation and public transit. Permits a redevelopment commission outside Marion County to provide revenue on an annual basis to a school corporation or public transportation corporation from property taxes allocated to the redevelopment commission in a tax increment financing allocation area. Specifies the amount of property taxes that may be transferred by the redevelopment commission. Requires a joint public hearing of the legislative body of the unit that established the tax increment financing area, the redevelopment commission, and the governing body of the school corporation or public transportation corporation and the adoption of substantially similar authorizing resolutions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-28HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-02-08SenateReferred to the House
2017-02-06SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2017-02-06SenateSenator Head added as coauthor
2017-02-06SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Lehman
2017-02-06SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 62: yeas 44, nays 4
2017-02-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-01-30SenateSenators Mishler, Tallian, Taylor G added as coauthors
2017-01-30SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second author
2017-01-30SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2017-01-26SenateSenator Niezgodski added as coauthor
2017-01-24SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2017-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Brown L

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback