IN SB0084 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Indemnification from legal malpractice claims. Provides that any provision in an agreement between an attorney and a client that purports to prospectively release the attorney from liability for malpractice is against public policy, void, and unenforceable.
Title
Indemnification from legal malpractice claims. Provides that any provision in an agreement between an attorney and a client that purports to prospectively release the attorney from liability for malpractice is against public policy, void, and unenforceable.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as second author |
2017-02-06 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Ober |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 61: yeas 45, nays 3 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown L |