IN SB0083 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Tax increment financing. Allows a redevelopment commission (including the Indianapolis metropolitan development commission) to the use up to 15% of the property tax proceeds allocated to a redevelopment district in a fiscal year for ongoing maintenance and repair of: (1) public ways; and (2) sewers, central water systems, central sewer systems, roads, sidewalks, and levees; that are located in an allocation area and that were funded in whole or in part with tax proceeds allocated to the redevelopment district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax increment financing. Allows a redevelopment commission (including the Indianapolis metropolitan development commission) to the use up to 15% of the property tax proceeds allocated to a redevelopment district in a fiscal year for ongoing maintenance and repair of: (1) public ways; and (2) sewers, central water systems, central sewer systems, roads, sidewalks, and levees; that are located in an allocation area and that were funded in whole or in part with tax proceeds allocated to the redevelopment district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-29SenateReferred to the House
2019-01-28SenateSenator Kruse added as coauthor
2019-01-28SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-01-28SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Beck
2019-01-28SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 35: yeas 35, nays 13
2019-01-24SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second author
2019-01-24SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-22SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Melton

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback