IN SB0082 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 51
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 51
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
FAFSA. Requires each school corporation and charter high school to: (1) use the model FAFSA notice prepared by the commission for higher education (commission); and (2) provide the model notice to certain students. Allows a nonpublic school to provide the model notice to certain students. Requires the commission to develop an online FAFSA affirmation form and provide information to certain schools to determine which students have completed the FAFSA and the affirmation form. Amends the information required to be included in the model FAFSA notice.
Title
FAFSA.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Stacey Donato [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Eddie Melton [D] |
Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Rodney Pol [D] | Rep. Robert Behning [R] | Rep. Michelle Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Public Law 51 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 331: yeas 45, nays 1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2022-03-01 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 295: yeas 89, nays 5 |
2022-02-24 | House | Amendment #2 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-24 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-21 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Pol added as coauthor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Becker added as coauthor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Davis M |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Behning |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 142: yeas 30, nays 19 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senator Melton added as coauthor |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as third author |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Senator Donato added as second author |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |