IN SB0082 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Public Law 138
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Mental health diagnosis. Defines "mental health diagnosis" and sets forth requirements that must be met in order for certain licensed professionals to provide a mental health diagnosis. Requires certain mental health professionals who are making a mental health diagnosis and who determine that the patient may have a physical condition that requires medical attention or has not been examined by a physician, an advanced practice registered nurse, or a physician assistant in the preceding 12 months to: (1) advise the patient to schedule, and offer to assist the patient with scheduling, a physical examination for the patient; (2) provide the patient with a list of practitioners and certain information concerning the practitioners; and (3) coordinate patient care with the practitioner as appropriate. Requires documentation of the actions of the licensed professional in the patient's medical record.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health diagnosis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenatePublic Law 138
2021-04-29SenateSigned by the Governor
2021-04-28SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-28HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-23SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-21HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 490: yeas 92, nays 0
2021-04-21SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 480: yeas 49, nays 0
2021-04-21HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2021-04-21SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2021-04-20HouseHouse advisors appointed: Saunders, Snow and Shackleford
2021-04-20HouseHouse conferees appointed: Cook and Porter
2021-04-19SenateSenate advisors appointed: Charbonneau and Melton
2021-04-19SenateSenate conferees appointed: Crider and Yoder
2021-04-19SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2021-04-19SenateMotion to dissent filed
2021-03-24HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-03-23HouseRepresentative Andrade M added as cosponsor
2021-03-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 288: yeas 94, nays 0
2021-03-22HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-01HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2021-02-10SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-09SenateSenator Ford Jon added as coauthor
2021-02-09SenateCosponsor: Representative Ziemke
2021-02-09SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Cook
2021-02-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 82: yeas 47, nays 0
2021-02-08SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-04SenateSenators Breaux, Yoder, Grooms added as coauthors
2021-02-04SenateSenator Becker added as coauthor
2021-02-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-28SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
2021-01-25SenateSenator Doriot added as coauthor
2021-01-25SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second author
2021-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2021-01-05SenateAuthored by Senator Crider

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/82/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/4/c/3/64c33bb4/SB0082.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/3/2/8332f523/SB0082.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/0/a/1c0a3d24/SB0082.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/e/1/dee1f023/SB0082.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/2/7/1327c7c2/SB0082.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/8/9/b08950e9/SB0082.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/3/2/6/8326af71/SB0082.04.ENRH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/b/3/d/6b3df127/SB0082.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/7/5/87753d19/SB0082.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/a/5/baa56d83/SB0082.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/e/2/9be20f4e/SB0082.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/d/9/e5d90615/SB0082.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/4/b/0d4b1565/SB0082.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/1/d/661d56af/SB0082.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/b/3/5eb37222/SB0082.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/3/2/2e32de9a/SB0082.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/c/8/e/3c8e8859/SB0082.03.COMH.DIS01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/6/8/2/b682c33b/SB0082.04.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/0/6/e1069d61/SB0082.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/e/2/2ae29938/SB0082.82_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/5/7/58573ef3/SB0082.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/6/8/f768f7a2/SB0082.288_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/b/a/2cba2bab/SB0082.480_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/3/a/a43a1f75/SB0082.490_H.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback