IN SB0081 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Section 8 effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the 14 member criminal law and sentencing policy study committee (study committee) to evaluate criminal laws and sentencing policies. Repeals laws establishing the sentencing policy study committee. Adds topics for the study committee to study and make recommendations about in the 2010 interim. Provides that the driver's license of a person convicted of resisting law enforcement while using a vehicle and: (1) exceeding the speed limit by at least 20 miles per hour; (2) committing criminal recklessness; or (3) engaging in reckless driving with a vehicle; may be suspended for one year for a first offense and two years for a second or subsequent offense. Provides that if a person receives a sentence that includes: (1) a term of incarceration; and (2) a driver's license suspension; the driver's license suspension begins on the date the person is released from incarceration and not on the date the person is convicted. Specifies in which court a petition for a hardship license must be filed. Requires the court to notify the bureau of motor vehicles of the person's conviction, and specifies that the convicted person has the burden of applying for a new or renewal license and establishing that the one year or two year period has elapsed. Enhances the penalty and prohibits a person from receiving a driver's license if a person has a second unrelated conviction for knowingly or intentionally operating a motor vehicle and has never received a valid driver's license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various criminal law matters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Section 8 effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Section 7 effective 03/24/2010
2010-03-25 Sections 1 through 6 effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Public Law 100
2010-03-24 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-19 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-03-16 Signed by the Speaker
2010-03-12 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-03-10 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 315: Yeas 91, Nays 4
2010-03-04 Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 267: Yeas 50, Nays 0
2010-03-04 Rules suspended
2010-03-04 Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House
2010-03-02 House advisors appointed: L. Lawson, Foley and Steuerwald
2010-03-02 House conferees appointed: Pierce and Clements
2010-03-02 Senate advisor appointed: Head and Randolph
2010-03-02 Senate conferee appointed: Steele and Arnold
2010-03-02 Senate dissented from House amendments
2010-02-25 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2010-02-25 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 228: Yeas 95, Nays 1
2010-02-22 Amendment 2 (Riecken), withdrawn
2010-02-22 Amendment 1 (Foley), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-22 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-02-18 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-02-16 Representative L. Lawson added as cosponsor
2010-02-16 Representative Pierce added as sponsor
2010-02-16 Representative L. Lawson removed as sponsor
2010-02-02 First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2010-01-26 Cosponsor: Rep. Foley
2010-01-26 House sponsor: Rep. L. Lawson
2010-01-26 Referred to the House
2010-01-26 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 39: Yeas 50 and Nays 0
2010-01-21 Senator Randolph added as coauthor
2010-01-21 Amendment 2 (Steele), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-01-21 Amendment 1 (Steele), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-01-21 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-01-11 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-05 Senator Steele added as second author
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections, Criminal, and Civil Matters
2010-01-05 Authored by Senator Arnold

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback