IN SB0080 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 211
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Code revision corrections. Addresses problems in the Indiana Code not suitable for resolution in the annual Technical Corrections bill, including corresponding amendment to certain percentages and overly broad or ambiguous language. Resolves technical conflicts between various enrolled acts passed during the 2019 legislative session. Corrects technical errors in various enrolled acts passed during the 2019 legislative session.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Code revision corrections. Addresses problems in the Indiana Code not suitable for resolution in the annual Technical Corrections bill, including corresponding amendment to certain percentages and overly broad or ambiguous language. Resolves technical conflicts between various enrolled acts passed during the 2019 legislative session. Corrects technical errors in various enrolled acts passed during the 2019 legislative session.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05SenatePublic Law 211
2019-05-05SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 635: yeas 97, nays 0
2019-04-24SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 595: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-24HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-24SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-11HouseHouse advisors appointed: Torr, Leonard, Boy and Moseley
2019-04-11HouseHouse conferees appointed: Steuerwald and DeLaney
2019-04-11SenateSenate advisors appointed: Messmer and Randolph Lonnie M
2019-04-11SenateSenate conferees appointed: Young M and Taylor G
2019-04-09SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2019-04-09SenateMotion to dissent filed
2019-03-12HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-03-11HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 302: yeas 94, nays 0
2019-03-07HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-25SenateReferred to the House
2019-01-24SenateSenator Messmer added as second author
2019-01-24SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Steuerwald
2019-01-24SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 21: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-01-22SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-01-22SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-16SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Young M

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/80/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/7/e/517e3860/SB0080.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/a/9/b0a9b45a/SB0080.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/0/1/8a016562/SB0080.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/8/1/f/a81f4a1b/SB0080.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/8/7/0a87b0b6/SB0080.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/e/a/13ea0982/SB0080.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/0/9/8209d408/SB0080.04.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/e/3/19e35f2c/SB0080.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/a/f/36afca2a/SB0080.21.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/c/e/afce9ed6/SB0080.02.COMS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/5/a/4/d5a4b6f7/SB0080.302.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/2/1/df210fce/SB0080.635.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/9/1/e2910fc2/SB0080.595.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback