IN SB0079 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by the Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Protection orders and domestic battery. Provides that if a petition for an order for protection is filed by a person or on behalf of an unemancipated minor, the court shall determine, after reviewing the petition or making an inquiry, whether issuing the order for protection may impact a school corporation's ability to provide in-person instruction for the person or the unemancipated minor. Creates a procedure that requires a school corporation to receive notice if the court determines that issuing the order for protection may impact the school corporation's ability to provide in-person instruction for the person or the unemancipated minor. Enhances the penalty for domestic battery to a Level 6 felony if the offense is committed against a family or household member: (1) who has been issued a protection order that protects the family or household member from the person and the protection order was in effect at the time the person committed the offense; or (2) while a no contact order issued by the court directing the person to refrain from having any direct or indirect contact with the family or household member was in effect at the time the person committed the offense. Enhances the penalty for domestic battery to a Level 5 felony when the offender has a prior conviction for strangulation against the same family or household member.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protection orders and domestic battery.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2021-04-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2021-04-05SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 343: yeas 47, nays 0
2021-04-01SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2021-04-01SenateSenator Qaddoura added as coauthor
2021-03-31SenateMotion to concur filed
2021-03-24HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2021-03-23HouseRepresentatives Negele and Speedy added as cosponsors
2021-03-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 287: yeas 94, nays 0
2021-03-22HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-03-18HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-01HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-02-02SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-01SenateHouse sponsor: Representative McNamara
2021-02-01SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 30: yeas 48, nays 0
2021-01-28SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2021-01-28SenateSenators Sandlin and Taylor G added as coauthors
2021-01-28SenateSenator Young M added as second author
2021-01-28SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-26SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-01-25SenateSenator Bassler added as coauthor
2021-01-11SenateSenator Walker K added as coauthor
2021-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-01-05SenateAuthored by Senator Crider

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/79/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/c/d/6dcd3922/SB0079.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/a/f/0faf890c/SB0079.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/a/c/94acb336/SB0079.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/b/b/5fbbf240/SB0079.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/c/3/22c3beb8/SB0079.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/a/6/c6a6c4a0/SB0079.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/d/d/0edd3e5e/SB0079.04.ENRH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/8/f/168f590a/SB0079.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/b/8/63b8a506/SB0079.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/a/6/08a680d8/SB0079.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/1/6/591692a9/SB0079.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/c/a/44ca82fa/SB0079.02.COMS.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/9/c/f69c9ac5/SB0079.02.COMS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/d/9/07d9d4e6/SB0079.03.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/9/b/3d9b0bc1/SB0079.03.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/0/2/ee02231a/SB0079.03.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/a/f/5dafce85/SB0079.03.COMH.CON01.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/9/2/b0926da3/SB0079.04.ENRH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/8/6/b0862f9d/SB0079.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/4/f/fa4f94a4/SB0079.30_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/6/1/3/56130c77/SB0079.02.COMS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/7/e/117e9249/SB0079.287_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/e/f/efefdd0e/SB0079.343_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback