IN SB0079 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Public Law 271
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Rights of police officers. Adds provisions establishing minimum due process and personnel rights of a full-time, paid, nonprobationary member of a police department (member) who is the subject of: (1) an internal investigation; or (2) an investigation of a complaint. Adds provisions regarding a member's (1) political activity; and (2) disclosure of property and assets.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rights of police officers. Adds provisions establishing minimum due process and personnel rights of a full-time, paid, nonprobationary member of a police department (member) who is the subject of: (1) an internal investigation; or (2) an investigation of a complaint. Adds provisions regarding a member's (1) political activity; and (2) disclosure of property and assets.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 61 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenatePublic Law 271
2019-05-06SenateSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-18SenateSenate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 531: yeas 43, nays 3
2019-04-17SenateMotion to concur filed
2019-04-16HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2019-04-15HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 520: yeas 61, nays 18
2019-04-11HouseAmendment #1 (Clere) ruled out of order
2019-04-11HouseAmendment #4 (Speedy) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-11HouseReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-09HousePlaced back on second reading
2019-04-08HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-14HouseRepresentative Lauer added as cosponsor
2019-03-11HouseRepresentative Bartels added as cosponsor
2019-02-26HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2019-02-13SenateReferred to the House
2019-02-12SenateSenator Buck added as coauthor
2019-02-12SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Speedy
2019-02-12SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 105: yeas 44, nays 5
2019-02-11SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-02-11SenateAmendment #2 (Sandlin) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-11SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-01-31SenateSenator Tomes added as second author
2019-01-31SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senator Sandlin

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/senate/79/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/1/c/e91c86a6/SB0079.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/7/a/2f7a909d/SB0079.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/c/3/e6c3b872/SB0079.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/e/3/74e37142/SB0079.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/b/7/89b77f0c/SB0079.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/b/7/8/bb78c26d/SB0079.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/f/2/f9f2f4f7/SB0079.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/9/d/259d32da/SB0079.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/0/b/a/50baac87/SB0079.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/a/2/e9a2653d/SB0079.05.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/f/0/c/cf0ce6fa/SB0079.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/c/0/2bc0fcc1/SB0079.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/b/7/7db7df98/SB0079.105.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/a/1/30a15fdb/SB0079.03.ENGS.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/2/f/022f6fd5/SB0079.520.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/a/7/41a713b1/SB0079.531.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback