IN SB0078 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Public Law 85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Public Law 85
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
1977 pension and disability fund. Provides that after July 1, 2022, if the board of trustees of the Indiana public retirement system (system board) determines that a new police officer or firefighter in the public employees' retirement fund (PERF) should be a member of the 1977 fund, the system board shall require the employer to transfer the member into the 1977 fund and contribute the amount that the system board determines is necessary to fund fully the member's service credit in the 1977 fund for all service earned as a police officer or firefighter in PERF. Provides that a police officer or firefighter who is an active member of the 1977 fund with an employer that participates in the 1977 fund, separates from that employer, and more than 180 days after the date of the separation becomes employed as a full-time police officer or firefighter with the same or a second employer that participates in the 1977 fund, is a member of the 1977 fund without meeting the age limitations under certain circumstances. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the interim study committee on pension management oversight.)
Title
1977 pension and disability fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] | Rep. Randall Frye [R] |
Rep. Mitch Gore [D] | Rep. Robert Morris [R] | Rep. Mike Andrade [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Public Law 85 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-23 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2022-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 229: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2022-02-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-17 | House | Representative Andrade M added as cosponsor |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-02-15 | House | Representative Morris added as cosponsor |
2022-02-15 | House | Representative Gore M added as cosponsor |
2022-01-31 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-11 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Frye R |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 8: yeas 46, nays 0 |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as third author |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as second author |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |