IN SB0078 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Hospital police departments. Provides that a police officer of a hospital police department (department) has county wide territorial jurisdiction only while the hospital police officer is on duty and in the performance of or engaged in the officer's normal duties. Provides that the governing board of a hospital may limit the department's jurisdiction. Requires the department to notify certain entities if the governing board of the hospital has limited the department's jurisdiction. Provides public access to certain records created by the department. Provides certain conditions under which a department officer may take action regarding a crime in progress.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospital police departments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-03-15HouseRepresentative Steuerwald added as cosponsor
2021-03-15HouseRepresentative Karickhoff added as sponsor
2021-03-15HouseRepresentative Steuerwald removed as sponsor
2021-03-15HouseRepresentative Karickhoff removed as cosponsor
2021-03-11HouseRepresentative Karickhoff added as cosponsor
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2021-02-23SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-22SenateSenator Sandlin added as second author
2021-02-22SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Steuerwald
2021-02-22SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 149: yeas 37, nays 12
2021-02-18SenateAmendment #2 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-18SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-09SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2021-01-05SenateAuthored by Senator Crider

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/78/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/2/3/6/02369697/SB0078.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/7/0/f970455b/SB0078.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/8/2/608296c4/SB0078.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/e/c/1becbbe9/SB0078.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/a/5/36a59304/SB0078.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/6/6/9b666453/SB0078.04.COMH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/e/b/5aeb8210/SB0078.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/6/5/0b65859a/SB0078.02.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/e/8/b/ae8bb4cf/SB0078.04.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/8/6/4/f8646499/SB0078.04.COMH.AMH002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/b/4/11b4fd39/SB0078.04.COMH.AMH003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/2/6/a5269826/SB0078.04.COMH.AMH004.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/3/6/69364d3c/SB0078.04.COMH.AMH005.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/6/a/3a6afc41/SB0078.04.COMH.AMH006.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/9/f/5c9f26d9/SB0078.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/9/e/fd9ea65a/SB0078.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/2/2/13229a6e/SB0078.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/e/4/dae4f66d/SB0078.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/5/d/5c5d23cf/SB0078.03.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/0/7/66075a40/SB0078.04.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/8/9/0b893b71/SB0078.03.ENGS.CRH001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/5/1/5f5100d5/SB0078.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/f/a/e7fa0139/SB0078.149_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/3/f/673fe28d/SB0078.03.ENGS.01.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback