IN SB0076 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-07 - Public Law 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Meet and confer for public safety employees. Allows an employer or an exclusive recognized representative of full-time employees of a police or fire department (exclusive representative) to request, in specified circumstances, an advisory opinion from the commissioner of labor (commissioner). Specifies a process by which an employer or exclusive representative may appeal in certain instances to the commissioner to request mediation and conciliation. Makes technical corrections and a conforming amendment.
Title
Meet and confer for public safety employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] |
Rep. Randall Frye [R] | Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Robert Morris [R] | Rep. Mitch Gore [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | Senate | Public Law 6 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 263: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2022-02-23 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2022-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 228: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2022-02-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-15 | House | Representative Gore M added as cosponsor |
2022-02-15 | House | Representative Morris added as cosponsor |
2022-02-01 | House | Reassigned to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2022-01-31 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2022-01-20 | House | Representative Clere added as cosponsor |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senator Young M added as third author |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as second author |
2022-01-11 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Frye R |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 7: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |