IN SB0075 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Sections 12 through 13 effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

. Allows a microbrewery to sell the brewery's beer for carryout on Sunday at the address for which the brewer's permit was issued. Allows alcoholic beverages to be sold on election days. Allows the holder of a retailer's permit to sell alcoholic beverages on Sunday from 7 a.m. until 3 a.m. the following day. (Under current law, the holder of a retailer permit may sell alcoholic beverages on Sunday from 10 a.m. until 12:30 a.m. the following day). Makes it a Class B misdemeanor for an alcoholic beverage permittee or permittee's employee or agent to recklessly, knowingly, or intentionally sell, barter, exchange, provide, or furnish another person alcoholic beverages for carryout without first requiring the person to produce proof that the person is at least 21 years of age by: (1) a driver's license; (2) a government issued identification card; or (3) a government issued document; that bears the person's photograph and birth date. Provides that it is a defense in a criminal or administrative proceeding that the individual to whom the alcoholic beverages were sold appeared to be at least 50 years of age. Provides that, in a criminal prosecution or proceeding before the alcohol and tobacco commission, it is a defense to a charge of unlawfully furnishing alcohol to a minor that the purchaser produced a government issued document bearing the purchaser's photograph and showing the purchaser to be at least 21 years of age. Eliminates the requirement that a publicly owned airport be served by a scheduled commercial passenger airline in order for a restaurant located in the passenger terminal to be eligible for a permit to sell beer, wine, and liquor. Allows an indoor theater located in a city having a population of more than 200,000 but less than 300,000 and that has been listed in the National Register of Historic places to: (1) be issued a one-way, two-way, or three-way permit to sell alcoholic beverages; and (2) to have children present. Requires alcohol servers, retailer permittees, or management representatives of retailer or dealer permittees to complete alcohol server training by May 1, 2011. (Current law requires completion of the training by January 1, 2010.) Requires an applicant for a permit to sell alcoholic beverages in Marion County to file with the local board verification from a department of the consolidated city designated by ordinance that the applicant is in compliance with zoning requirements for the premises to be licensed.(Current law requires verification from the department of metropolitan development.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Sections 12 through 13 effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Section 11 effective 03/12/2010
2010-03-25 Sections 5 through 10 effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Section 4 effective 03/12/2010
2010-03-25 Section 3 effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Sections 1 through 2 effective 03/12/2010
2010-03-25 Public Law 10
2010-03-12 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-11 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-03-08 Signed by the Speaker
2010-03-04 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-03-01 Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 243: Yeas 28, Nays 17
2010-03-01 Motion to concur in House amendments filed
2010-02-25 Returned to the Senate with amendments
2010-02-25 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 227: Yeas 74, Nays 21
2010-02-22 Amendment 5 (Bell), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-22 Amendment 1 (Sullivan), prevailed; Voice Vote
2010-02-22 Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2010-02-18 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-02-09 First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
2010-01-21 Cosponsor: Rep. Bell
2010-01-21 House sponsor: Rep. VanHaaften
2010-01-21 Referred to the House
2010-01-21 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 25: Yeas 41 and Nays 9
2010-01-19 Senator Sipes added as coauthor
2010-01-19 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-14 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Public Policy & Interstate Cooperation
2010-01-05 Authored by Senators Simpson and Alting

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback