IN SB0073 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends provisions regarding traffic signals to refer to turn arrow signals in addition to circular signals. Provides that a person who operates a vehicle and fails to obey the instructions of a railroad flagman to stop the vehicle before approaching a location at which a train is or may be located commits a Class C infraction. Requires the driver of a vehicle to stop at a railroad crossing upon the approach of on-track equipment. Specifies the action required to comply with a flashing "don't walk" indicator at a pedestrian crossing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic signal and railroad crossing matters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Public Law 8
2010-03-12 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-09 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-02-25 Signed by the Speaker
2010-02-24 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-02-22 Returned to the Senate without amendments
2010-02-22 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 188: Yeas 93, Nays 0
2010-02-18 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-02-16 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-02-02 First reading: referred to Committee on Interstate and International Cooperation
2010-01-21 Cosponsors: Reps. Soliday, Austin and Duncan
2010-01-21 House sponsor: Rep. Tyler
2010-01-21 Referred to the House
2010-01-21 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 24: Yeas 50 and Nays 0
2010-01-19 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-14 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-01-05 First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation & Veterans Affairs
2010-01-05 Authored by Senators Wyss and Arnold

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback