IN SB0072 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-02 - First Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicle manufacturer sales. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate study committee for the 2015 interim the task of studying the sale by a motor vehicle manufacturer of new motor vehicles directly to consumers other than through an independent franchised new motor vehicle dealer that has a physical place of business capable of performing complete warranty service on motor vehicles produced by the manufacturer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle manufacturer sales. Urges the legislative council to assign to the appropriate study committee for the 2015 interim the task of studying the sale by a motor vehicle manufacturer of new motor vehicles directly to consumers other than through an independent franchised new motor vehicle dealer that has a physical place of business capable of performing complete warranty service on motor vehicles produced by the manufacturer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce & Technology - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-02HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
2015-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2015-02-23SenateRepresentative Burton added as sponsor
2015-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 203: yeas 48, nays 1
2015-02-19SenateSenator Merritt added as third author
2015-02-19SenateSenator Head added as second author
2015-02-19SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2015-02-16SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-12SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2015-01-29SenateSenator Buck added as author
2015-01-29SenateSenator Long removed as author
2015-01-29SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted, reassigned to committee on Commerce & Technology
2015-01-06SenateFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Rules & Legislative Procedure
2015-01-06SenateAuthored by Senator Long

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback