IN SB0069 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-05 - Placed back on second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

School bus stop arm violation enforcement. Specifies that a registered owner of a motor vehicle commits an infraction if the owner's vehicle is used to violate the school bus stop arm law. Provides a defense for a registered owner who provides certain information to law enforcement and fully cooperates with law enforcement, if: (1) the vehicle was stolen; (2) the registered owner routinely engages in the business of renting the vehicle; or (3) the registered owner provided the vehicle for the use of an employee. Specifies that: (1) the bureau of motor vehicles may not assess points for the infraction; and (2) an adjudication for the infraction does not create a presumption of liability in a civil action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School bus stop arm violation enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-05HousePlaced back on second reading
2021-03-30HouseAmendment #1 (Slager) prevailed; Division of the House: yeas 48, nays 44
2021-03-30HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-03-25HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2021-03-04HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
2021-02-24SenateReferred to the House
2021-02-23SenateCosponsor: Representative Pressel
2021-02-23SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Slager
2021-02-23SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 170: yeas 38, nays 11
2021-02-22SenateAmendment #3 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-22SenateReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-16SenatePlaced back on second reading
2021-02-15SenateAmendment #1 (Tallian) failed; Division of the Senate: yeas 11, nays 33
2021-02-15SenateAmendment #2 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote
2021-02-15SenateReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-02-09SenatePlaced back on second reading
2021-02-04SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2021-02-04SenateSenator Bohacek added as second author
2021-02-04SenateSenator Bohacek removed as coauthor
2021-02-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2021-01-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-01-04SenateAuthored by Senator Niemeyer

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/senate/69/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/3/2/49323c39/SB0069.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/6/1/dd610197/SB0069.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/2/2/f/b22f0d05/SB0069.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/9/d/499d4e24/SB0069.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/a/b/6aab3522/SB0069.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/b/b/adbba96b/SB0069.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/3/c/983c1888/SB0069.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/9/d/0e9dee4d/SB0069.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/5/8/10584777/SB0069.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/d/3/e6d37ae8/SB0069.05.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/f/d/befdf038/SB0069.06.ENGH.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/7/9/d/f79d34a1/SB0069.02.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/8/e/2/08e223c9/SB0069.02.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/7/9/c/879cb011/SB0069.03.ENGS.AMS003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/5/e/a45e55e7/SB0069.05.COMH.AMH001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/2/a/1f2a7fd1/SB0069.06.ENGH.AMH002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/e/c/3/8ec31545/SB0069.06.ENGH.AMH003.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/b/7/8db7eb01/SB0069.06.ENGH.AMH004.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/b/2/26b237bd/SB0069.06.ENGH.AMH005.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/9/e/d09edf54/SB0069.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/9/b/8/f9b88864/SB0069.01.INTR.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/f/8/89f80473/SB0069.02.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/a/e/caae2baf/SB0069.02.COMS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/3/0/9f30b0d6/SB0069.03.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/4/6/e/846e8d16/SB0069.04.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/9/5/8f956c06/SB0069.04.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/0/1/ca01a164/SB0069.04.ENGS.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/c/3/6fc35be4/SB0069.05.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/b/e/49be7ae2/SB0069.06.ENGH.FN001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/0/6/3606a343/SB0069.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/b/8/14b891f6/SB0069.170_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/b/2/1db23503/SB0069.04.ENGS.00.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback